Hardesty v. Carroll et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Hardesty
Defendant: Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc., Simbeck, Inc., Custom Personnel, Inc. and Charles Melvin Carroll
Case Number: 3:2020cv00051
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Service Agreement)(Lanham, Joshua)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Caltrider on behalf of All Defendants (Caltrider, Joseph)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Wayne Hardesty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Motion)(Harman, Ronald)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Caltrider, Joseph)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Melvin Carroll, Custom Personnel, Inc., Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc., Simbeck, Inc. . (Caltrider, Joseph)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 04/15/2020. (cwm)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Caltrider, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Custom Personnel, Inc.. (Caltrider, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc.. (Caltrider, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simbeck, Inc.. (Caltrider, Joseph)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDINGDISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 03/20/2020. (cwm)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Charles Melvin Carroll, Custom Personnel, Inc., Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc., Simbeck, Inc..(Caltrider, Joseph)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number 20-C-32), filed by Simbeck, Inc., Custom Personnel, Inc., Charles Melvin Carroll, and Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00 - Receipt #0424-3011770. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Notice, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardesty v. Carroll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Transportation Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Caltrider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simbeck, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Caltrider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Personnel, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L. Caltrider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Melvin Carroll
Represented By: Joseph L. Caltrider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Hardesty
Represented By: Mark Jenkinson
Represented By: Ronald M. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?