Smith v. Flemings et al
Plaintiff: Brittany D. Smith
Defendant: Patterson's Drug Store, Inc. and David Morris Flemings
Case Number: 3:2020cv00055
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Morris Flemings, Patterson's Drug Store, Inc.. (Taylor, Trevor)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Early Discovery by Brittany D. Smith. (Robinette, Jeffery)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 4/27/2020. (tlg)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin T. Gillen. Contact information has been updated. (cmd)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Morris Flemings, Patterson's Drug Store, Inc. Defendants', David Morrison Flemings and Patterson's Drug Store, Inc, First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions, and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Brittany D. Smith. (Taylor, Trevor)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by David Morris Flemings, Patterson's Drug Store, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Taylor, Trevor) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/23/2020 with PDF version) (tlg).
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Patterson's Drug Store, Inc. served on 4/6/2020. (tlg)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Morris Flemings, Patterson's Drug Store, Inc., filed by Brittany D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-3015945(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Flemings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson's Drug Store, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor K. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Morris Flemings
Represented By: Trevor K. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany D. Smith
Represented By: Jeffery L. Robinette
Represented By: Kevin T. Gillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?