Jones v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Jessie Jones, Jr.
Respondent: Warden R. Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2020cv00090
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/29/2020. (nmm)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/24/2020. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and to Pay the $5.00 Filing Fee re: #5 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE by Jessie Jones, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/15/2020. (cwm)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/08/2020. (cwm)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/11/2020. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jessie Jones. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessie Jones. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden R. Hudgins, filed by Jessie Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Supporting Facts, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessie Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden R. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?