Younker v. City of Keiser et al
Plaintiff: Mark Younker
Defendant: City of Keiser and Paul Sabin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00102
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 filed by Mark Younker. (Riddell, Christian)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alonzo D Washington on behalf of City of Keiser (Washington, Alonzo)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Younker.(Riddell, Christian)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/22/2020. (tlg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by City of Keiser, Paul Sabin re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 . (Foster, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 by City of Keiser, Paul Sabin. (Foster, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by City of Keiser re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Foster, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Keiser. (Foster, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Paul Sabin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foster, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Keiser served on 6/29/2020. (Riddell, Christian)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Paul Sabin served on 6/29/2020. (Riddell, Christian)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Keiser, Paul Sabin, filed by Mark Younker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3059603(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Younker v. City of Keiser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Keiser
Represented By: Jeffrey A Foster
Represented By: Alonzo D Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sabin
Represented By: Jeffrey A Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Younker
Represented By: Christian Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?