Gipson v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Darion Gipson
Defendant: Medical, S:S, CO Rosier, West Stone, CO Watson and Hazelton USP Mail Room
Case Number: 3:2020cv00135
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from Darion Gipson to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). A response letter #13 addressing the same issue was sent on 9/8/2020.(tlg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER from deputy clerk to Darion Gipson regarding #12 Letter. (tlg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER from Darion Gipson to deputy clerk regarding #11 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER from deputy clerk to Darion Gipson regarding #10 Letter. (tlg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Darion Gipson to Clerk regarding #9 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Darion Gipson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Copy of docket sheet sent.(tlg)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/28/2020) (tlg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2020) (tlg).
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Darion Gipson. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/4/2020. (tlg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/4/2020. (tlg)
July 31, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble no longer assigned to case per #6 order. (tlg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 7/31/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Darion Gipson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Darion Gipson. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(cwm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darion Gipson. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical, Rosier, S:S, West Stone, Watson, filed by Darion Gipson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S:S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Rosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazelton USP Mail Room
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darion Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?