USA Parts Supply et al v. Chiacchieri et al
Appellant: Oldsmobile USA, L.P., Cadillac USA and USA Parts Supply
Appellee: Christopher Corrado and Michael Chiacchieri
Case Number: 3:2020cv00145
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER. For Court scheduling purposes, the evidentiary hearing previously scheduled for October 14, 2020 is RESCHEDULED for FRIDAY, 10/23/2020, AT 01:30 PM in Martinsburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 1st Floor before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10-2-2020. (dh)
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DISTRICT COURT'S RECEIPT AND FILING OF DESIGNATED RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:20-bk-00241. (tlg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 DESIGNATED RECORD ON APPEAL: (Attachments: #1 transmittal sheet, #2 Item 1 - AP public docket sheet, #3 Item 2 - Complaint, #4 Item 3 - Motion to dismiss, #5 Item 4 - Order on motion to dismiss adversary proceeding, #6 Item 5 - Amended complaint with exhibits A-F, #7 Item 6 - Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding, #8 Item 7 - Response to motion to dismiss adversary proceeding, #9 Item 8 - Memorandum opinion, #10 Item 9 - Notice of appeal, #11 Item 10 - Order, #12 Item 11 - Transcript of June 9, 2020 hearing, #13 Item 16 - Proof of claim, #14 Item 17 - Debtor's objection to claim no. 5, #15 Item 18 - Notice of appeal, #16 Item 19 - Opposition to motion for leave to appeal, #17 Item 20 - Trial exhibit nos. 13, 16, 17, #18 Item 23 - Motion for leave to appeal, #19 Item 24 - Transmittal of notice of appeal, #20 Item 25 - Clerk's service of notice of appeal, #21 Item 26 - Appellant designation of contents, #22 Item 27 - Appellee designation of contents, #23 Item 28 - BK public docket sheet).(tlg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 Exhibit List by USA Parts Supply.(Campbell, James)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER. For Court scheduling purposes, the Evidentiary Hearing previously scheduled for September 23, 2020, is RESCHEDULED to WEDNESDAY, 10/14/2020, AT 01:30 PM in Martinsburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 1st Floor before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9-22-2020. (dh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 Exhibit List by Michael Chiacchieri, Christopher Corrado.(Hinkle, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Supplement to Opposition to Motion to Leave to Appeal filed by Michael Chiacchieri, Christopher Corrado. (Hinkle, David)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by David J Hinkle (Hinkle, David)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Second MOTION #9 to Continue Evidentiary Hearing. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Evidentiary hearing is CONTINUED TO WEDNESDAY, 9/23/2020, AT 01:30 PM in Martinsburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 1st Floor before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9-2-2020. (dh)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 Second MOTION to Continue Hearing on September 9, 2020 at 1:30 pm by Michael Chiacchieri, Christopher Corrado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hinkle, David)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court finds that Appellees did NOT comply with LR Gen P 88.02 in its Motion #7 to Continue. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Appellees MOTION #7 is DENIED. Appellees are GRANTED LEAVE TO REFILE in compliance with LR Gen P 88.02. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9-2-2020. (dh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Hearing on September 9, 2020 at 1:30 pm by Michael Chiacchieri, Christopher Corrado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hinkle, David)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ARGUMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/31/2020. (tlg)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 8/27/2020. (tlg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE #2 TO APPEAL AN INTERLOCUTORY ORDER, filed by Michael Chiacchieri, Christopher Corrado. (tlg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (tlg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL AN INTERLOCUTORY ORDER by Cadillac USA, Oldsmobile USA, L.P., USA Parts Supply. (tlg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:20-bk-00241, filed by USA Parts Supply, Cadillac USA, Oldsmobile USA, L.P. (Attachments: #1 transmittal sheet).(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA Parts Supply et al v. Chiacchieri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Oldsmobile USA, L.P.
Represented By: James P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cadillac USA
Represented By: James P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: USA Parts Supply
Represented By: James P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christopher Corrado
Represented By: James M. Hoffman
Represented By: David J Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Chiacchieri
Represented By: James M. Hoffman
Represented By: David J Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?