Bailey v. United States of America
Petitioner: Andrew Bailey
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00147
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/21/2020 per USPS wesbite. (cwm)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 09/18/2020. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 08/21/2020. (cwm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved 2241 Forms) Notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against United States of America, filed by Andrew Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Sentencing Monitoring Computation Data, #2 Male Custody Classification Form, and #3 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?