Gray v. Adams et al
Petitioner: Tabitha Burks Gray
Respondent: United States of America and Warden P. Adams
Case Number: 3:2020cv00169
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/8/2020 per USPS website. (tlg)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/5/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/15/2020. (tlg)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tabitha Burks Gray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against P. Adams, United States of America, filed by Tabitha Burks Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, warden response; #2 Exhibit B, medical records; #3 Exhibit C, individualized needs plan; #4 Exhibit D, letter; #5 Exhibit E, female custody classification form; #6 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden P. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tabitha Burks Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?