Hairston v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Lee Hairston
Defendant: West Virginia Bureau for Child Support Enforcement, The State Supreme Court for its Aquiesce to the Clerks Unconstitutional Conduct, Jennifer C. Shomo, Edythe Nash Gaiser, Sally Jackson and The Family Court of Berkeley County Martinsburg
Case Number: 3:2020cv00174
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/27/2020 per USPS website. (cwm)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/21/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble no longer assigned to case per #8 order. (tlg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order Referring Motion. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/9/2020. (tlg)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/7/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/19/2020 per USPS website. (tlg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Aaron Lee Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron Lee Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edythe Nash Gaiser, Sally Jackson, Jennifer C. Shomo, The Family Court of Berkeley County Martinsburg, The State Supreme Court for its Aquiesce to the Clerks Unconstitutional Conduct, West Virginia Bureau for Child Support Enforcement, filed by Aaron Lee Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hairston v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Bureau for Child Support Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Supreme Court for its Aquiesce to the Clerks Unconstitutional Conduct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer C. Shomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edythe Nash Gaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Family Court of Berkeley County Martinsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Lee Hairston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?