Johnson v. Absher et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Thomas Johnson
Defendant: Gregory Mims, Officer Willis, M. Absher and Officer Hackney
Case Number: 3:2020cv00189
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/2020. (tlg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Wayne Thomas Johnson. (Attachments: #1 warden response, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel defendants to take pictures by Wayne Thomas Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/4/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and executed consent sent to financial deputy and trustee clerk.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Wayne Thomas Johnson. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/9/2020. (tlg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Wayne Thomas Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Wayne Thomas Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wayne Thomas Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Absher, Officer Hackney, Gregory Mims, Officer Willis, filed by Wayne Thomas Johnson. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims. File-stamped copy returned as requested.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Absher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Thomas Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Absher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?