Skaggs v. Maston et al
Plaintiff: Shelby Dean Skaggs
Defendant: Wexford Health Resources, Carla Deem, Dr. James Beane, Betsy Jividen, Marie Doe, Hanger Orthopedic and Russell Maston
Case Number: 3:2020cv00198
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
2 Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/23/2020. (tlg)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/19/2020. (cwm)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/19/2020. (cwm)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/15/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #2 TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/15/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and executed consent sent to financial deputy and trustee officer.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/14/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shelby Dean Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Shelby Dean Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Shelby Dean Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shelby Dean Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Beane, Carla Deem, Marie Doe, Hanger Orthopedic, Betsy Jividen, Russell Maston, Wexford Health Resources, filed by Shelby Dean Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, inmate grievance form; #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skaggs v. Maston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Deem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. James Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanger Orthopedic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Maston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Dean Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?