Matthews v. City of Ranson, West Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Charles Matthews
Defendant: William Roper, Robbie R. Roberts, Ranson City Police Department, Patrolman Ryan Jenkins and City of Ranson, West Virginia
Case Number: 3:2020cv00221
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 1/20/2021. (cmd)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order Checklist Other Document filed by City of Ranson, West Virginia. (Lynch, Jennifer)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lynch, Jennifer)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law AND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS IN LIGHT OF NEW CASE LAW IN WEST VIRGINIA filed by City of Ranson, West Virginia, Ryan Jenkins. (Lynch, Jennifer)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law filed by Charles Matthews. (Batten, Dylan)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/9/2020. (cmd)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law by City of Ranson, West Virginia, Ryan Jenkins. (Lynch, Jennifer)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Ranson, West Virginia, Ryan Jenkins.(Lynch, Jennifer)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Jefferson County Circuit Court, (case number 20-C-67), filed by Ryan Jenkins, City of Ranson, West Virginia, Ranson City Police Department, William Roper, Robbie R. Roberts. Filing Fee $402.00 PAID - Receipt #0424-3166995. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment A - Docket Sheet, #3 Attachment B - Complaint, #4 Attachment C - Notice to Clerk of Filing Notice of Removal)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. City of Ranson, West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Roper
Represented By: Jennifer A. Lynch
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie R. Roberts
Represented By: Jennifer A. Lynch
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranson City Police Department
Represented By: Jennifer A. Lynch
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrolman Ryan Jenkins
Represented By: Jennifer A. Lynch
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ranson, West Virginia
Represented By: Jennifer A. Lynch
Represented By: Cy A. Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Matthews
Represented By: Dylan Kief Batten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?