Stevens v. Tolliver et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Frank Stevens
Defendant: D. D. Tolliver, Joe Yeager and R. Petrousky
Case Number: 3:2021cv00016
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN RECEIPT as to #15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 02/27/2021. (cwm)
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order and #12 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS PREMATURE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 02/16/2021. (cwm)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 02/17/2021. (cwm) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING; #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS COMPLAINT and #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 02/08/2021. (cwm)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS PREMATURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 02/10/2021. (cwm) Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 02/10/2021. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Form IFP)(cwm) Copy of order and IFP mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 COURT-APPROVED FORM re: #1 Complaint, filed by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Envelope)(cwm) Modified: entry restricted due to containing e-gov violations per TRW Chambers (BS) on 2/10/2021 (cwm).
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Settlement Conference by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(cwm)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment Rule 56 by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(cwm)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 1/29/2021. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Bivens Form)(cwm) Copy of order and forms mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Form) Notice and forms mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R. Petrousky, D. D. Tolliver, and Joe Yeager, filed by Joseph Frank Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Amb Report, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) Attachment 1 restricted violates egov act per GMG Chambers (WB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Tolliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. D. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Petrousky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Frank Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?