Moffat v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kristin Melissa Moffat
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv00129
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Carey, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Carey, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Carey, James)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/13/2021. (tlg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 Pro hac vice filing fee as to Karl Osterhout: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNM001899 (tlg)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kristin Melissa Moffat. (Carey, James)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristin Melissa Moffat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, James)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kristin Melissa Moffat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3308166(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffat v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Melissa Moffat
Represented By: James T. Carey
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?