Williams v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Plaintiff: Bud Pratt Williams
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/22/2022. (tlg)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 notice of deficient pleading, #2 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2022: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 Mail sent to Bud Pratt Williams #6 Notice (Other) Returned as Undeliverable. (not deliverable as addressed) (tlg)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. Mailed to pls by cm,rrr. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form Bivens packet)(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (je).
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 Entry done in error and not mailed. (cmd) Modified on 1/3/2022 (cmd).
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-24452. (cmd)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of West Virginia. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (pc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/3/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II (daa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/3/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to Bivens against Federal Bureau of Prisons. Filing fee $ 402.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP Motion not filed), filed by Bud Pratt Williams.(daa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/3/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Pratt Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?