Manns v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Tony Manns
Respondent: Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2022cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TERMINATING MOTION #6 AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 3/2/2022. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 1, 2022 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM002011 (tlg)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. PER USPS: "Your package is moving within the USPS network and is on track to be delivered to its final destination. It is currently in transit to the next facility." (tlg)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION #5 FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 1/28/2022. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Manns. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time by Tony Manns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, lockdown status notification; #2 Envelope).(tlg)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/7/2022 per USPS website. (tlg)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Mailed to pro se petitioner by cm,rrr. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form IFP and PTAR)(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Mailed to pro se petitioner by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Hudgins, filed by Tony Manns. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manns v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Manns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?