Vogt v. Macy's Logistics and Operations et al
Plaintiff: Christina M. Vogt
Defendant: Macy's Logistics and Operations and Macys.com LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00010
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss All Motions, Claims, and Orders by the Defense filed by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Leonoro, Joseph)
March 29, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Recusal filed by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Leonoro, Joseph)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/23/2022. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 16, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss All Motions, Claims and Orders by the Defense, by Christina M. Vogt. Pleading was hand-delivered. (tlg)
March 16, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Recusal by Christina M. Vogt. Pleading was hand-delivered. (tlg)
March 15, 2022 Filing 17 Defendants' Scheduling Order Checklist Other Document filed by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Leonoro, Joseph)
March 15, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leonoro, Joseph)
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leonoro, Joseph)
February 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christina M. Vogt. Pleading was hand-delivered to clerk's office depository. (tlg)
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Order Granting re #9 MOTION for Sanctions and Prefiling Injunction, #11 MOTION for Sanctions for Prefiling Injunction Under the All Writs Act by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Leonoro, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Prefiling Injunction Under the All Writs Act by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC re #11 MOTION for Sanctions for Prefiling Injunction Under the All Writs Act . (Leonoro, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Sanctions for Prefiling Injunction Under the All Writs Act by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Leonoro, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Prefiling Injunction by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC re #9 MOTION for Sanctions and Prefiling Injunction . (Leonoro, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Sanctions and Prefiling Injunction by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Leonoro, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Order Granting re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Leonoro, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Leonoro, Joseph)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Macy's Logistics and Operations, Macys.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Leonoro, Joseph)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Macys.com LLC identifying Corporate Parent Macy's Inc. for Macys.com LLC.. (Leonoro, Joseph)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Macy's Logistics and Operations identifying Corporate Parent Macy's Corporate Services, LLC for Macy's Logistics and Operations.. (Leonoro, Joseph)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/1/2022. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number CC-02-2021-C-412), filed by Macys.com LLC, Macy's Logistics and Operations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, state court documents, #2 Exhibit 2A, documents served on defendants, #3 Exhibit 2B, documents served on defendants, #4 Exhibit 2C, documents served on defendants, #5 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3415005(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogt v. Macy's Logistics and Operations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Logistics and Operations
Represented By: Joseph U. Leonoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys.com LLC
Represented By: Joseph U. Leonoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?