Dean v. Entzel et al
Plaintiff: Todd G. Dean
Defendant: F. Entzel, Chaplain Maria, Chaplain Fuentes, Supervisory Chaplain Kyler and Six Unknown Agents
Case Number: 3:2022cv00067
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Todd G. Dean. (Attachments: #1 Ledger sheets, #2 Envelope)(je)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to accept Trust Account Report, styled Motion to Except Trust Account Report by Todd G. Dean. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(je)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/18/2022. (tlg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Todd G. Dean. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Todd G. Dean. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd G. Dean. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F. Entzel, Chaplain Fuentes, Supervisory Chaplain Kyler, Chaplain Maria, Six Unknown Agents, filed by Todd G. Dean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, claim for damage, injury or death; #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and PSLC Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Entzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd G. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisory Chaplain Kyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Unknown Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?