Neyens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Geraldine Louise Neyens
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00083
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/25/2022. (Dils, Jan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Vincent Palmer on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Palmer, Jordan)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION #2 TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 5/9/2022. (tlg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Geraldine Louise Neyens. (tlg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Geraldine Louise Neyens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 proposed summonses).(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neyens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Louise Neyens
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jordan Vincent Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?