Prigmore v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: William Prigmore
Defendant: Acting Warden S. Brown, FCI Hazelton Staff, Multiple Unknown Agents of FBOP and Multiple Contractors and Outside Visitors to FBOP
Case Number: 3:2022cv00166
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/15/2022 per USPS website. (tlg) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/21/2022) (tlg).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/9/2022. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 11, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/6/2022. (tlg)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Biven Forms)(cwm) Notice and forms mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 5:22-cv-00383. (cwm)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE directing that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division, for further consideration; the Clerk shall transmit Plaintiff's file to the Clerk of Courts at the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/29/2022. (cc: Plaintiff) (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/30/2022.]
September 22, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT by William Prigmore against Warden S. Brown, Multiple Unknown Agents of FBOP, Multiple Contractors and Outside Visitors to FBOP. (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/30/2022.]
September 7, 2022 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/30/2022.]
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/30/2022.]
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COPY OF ORDER entered 9/7/2022, directing the Clerk to open a new civil action pursuant to Bivens v. Six Unknown Federal Agents of Federal Bureau of Narcotics, 403 U.S. 388, 91 S.Ct. 1999, 24 L.Ed.2d 619 (1971), to include a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, and to send Plaintiff a copy of a form Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/7/2022. (btm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/30/2022.]
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (originally filed as a Complaint in Civil Action 5:22-cv-00331). (btm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/30/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prigmore v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Prigmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Warden S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Hazelton Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiple Unknown Agents of FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiple Contractors and Outside Visitors to FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?