Bank of Charles Town v. Testa et al
Plaintiff: Bank of Charles Town
Defendant: Vittorio Testa and Ischia, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00226
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by M. David Griffith, Jr on behalf of Vittorio Testa (Griffith, M.)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Vittorio Testa by Vittorio Testa. (Attachments: #1 Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition)(Griffith, M.)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Bank of Charles Town. Responses due by 1/8/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment, #2 Proposed Order)(Hallam, William)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ischia, Inc., and Vittorio Testa. (cwm) Copy mailed to Ischia, Inc., and Vittorio Testa
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bank of Charles Town. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Non-Military Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Hallam, William)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, of Service on Ischia, Inc., Attn Vittorio Testa, President by Bank of Charles Town. (Hallam, William)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, of Service on Vittorio Testa by Bank of Charles Town. (Hallam, William)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE: Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case, with filing fee being paid through pay.gov on 10/30/2023. However, filer failed to complete filing process, following receipt of payment. Clerk's office notified filer of the incomplete document filing and the Complaint was received on 10/31/2023. (tlg)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of Charles Town identifying Corporate Parent Potomac BancShares, Inc. for Bank of Charles Town. (tlg)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ischia, Inc., Vittorio Testa, filed by Bank of Charles Town. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, promissory note (commercial - single advance); #2 Exhibit B, commercial loan agreement (single advance loan); #3 Exhibit C, first amendment to loan documents; #4 Exhibit D, second amendment to loan documents; #5 Exhibit E, promissory note (commercial - revolving draw); #6 Exhibit F, commercial loan agreement (revolving draw loan); #7 Exhibit G, extension letter for committed line of credit; #8 Exhibit H, extension letter for committed line of credit; #9 Exhibit I, debt modification agreement; #10 Exhibit J, letter; #11 Exhibit K, guaranty (January 10, 2020); #12 Exhibit L, guaranty (February 4, 2020); #13 Exhibit M, refinance deed of trust and assignment of leases and rents; #14 Exhibit N, commercial credit line deed of trust and security agreement; #15 Exhibit O, forbearance agreement; #16 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing fee $402.00 RECEIVED 10/30/2023 Receipt # AWVNDC-3815782.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Charles Town v. Testa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Charles Town
Represented By: Joshua D. Bradley
Represented By: William L Hallam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vittorio Testa
Represented By: M. David Griffith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ischia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?