Magers et al v. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeremiah N. Magers and Andrea J. Magers
Defendant: Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv00049
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
County: Marshall
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION, LLC'S 102 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION, LLC'S 101 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF JOHN HEMPEL, AND SCHEDU LING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The defendant Columbia GasTransmission, LLC's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Further, the defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC's motion to exclude testimony is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Fur ther, it is ORDERED that the remaining parties appear by counsel for a status and scheduling conference on September 29,2014 at 1:15 p.m. in the chambers of Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr., Federal Building, 1125 Chapline Street, Wheeling, West Virginia 26003. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/2/2014. (kac)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 60 MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS 62 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file Exhibit B to the plaintiffs motion to amend (ECF No. 62) as plaintiffs second amended complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 12/6/2013. (kac)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendant CNX Gas Company, LLC's 44 Motion to Dismiss; CNX Gas Company, L.L.C. terminated as party defendant. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/13/13. (soa)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER : Confirming Pronounced Order Denying Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC's 29 Motion to Dismiss But Granting 29 Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 4/10/13. (soa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magers et al v. Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah N. Magers
Represented By: Joseph R. Canestraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea J. Magers
Represented By: Joseph R. Canestraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC
Represented By: Larry W. Blalock
Represented By: Whitney G. Clegg
Represented By: Brian R. Swiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?