Weirton Medical Center, Inc. v. Community Health Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Weirton Medical Center, Inc.
Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc., Quorum Health Resources, LLC, Stephen Miller, Michael Rolph, Robert Lovell, Robert Vento, Daniel Hamman and John Waltko
Case Number: 5:2015cv00132
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
County: Brooke
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 30 MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD, GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 87 MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT, CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD, DENYING PLAINTIFF� 39;S 81 MOTION TO EXPEDITE RULING ON PENDING MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD AS MOOT AND DISMISSING DEFENDANTS' 13 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment on this matter as to defendants Quorum Health Resou rces, LLC, Stephen Miller, Michael Rolph, Robert Lovell, Robert Vento, Daniel Hamman, and John Waltko, and award defendants the amount of administrative costs, to be paid by Weirton, in the amount of Eight Thousand Seven Hundred Three Dollars and Seventy-Five Cents ($8,703.75). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 12/12/17. (counsel via CM/ECF) (lmm)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING AS FRAMED DEFENDANTS' 62 64 MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS. The parties are directed to take the depositions of Robert Vento and John Waltko on July 6, 2017 in Nashville Tennessee. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 6/27/17. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (lmm)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 12 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. This Court finds that the case should be, and hereby is, ORDERED submitted to arbitration. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/10/16. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weirton Medical Center, Inc. v. Community Health Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weirton Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick S. Casey
Represented By: Sandra M. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quorum Health Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hamman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Waltko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?