Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC and Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC
Defendant: Canal Barge Company and The Ohio County Coal Company
Respondent: Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc. and Mon River Towing, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Inland Marine Service, Inc. and Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
In Re: Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the Motor Vessel Capt Robert G Harrison
Case Number: 5:2018cv00115
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION for Entry of Default by Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC, Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC(For Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the Motor Vessel Capt Robert G Harrison). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fornella, Leonard)
September 5, 2018 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC, Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC(For Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the Motor Vessel Capt Robert G Harrison). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Fornella, Leonard)
September 5, 2018 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hammond Family Holdings, Inc. for Inland Marine Service, Inc.; Corporate Parent Blue Danube Incorporated for Campbell Transportation Co., Inc... (Powers, Todd)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/26/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2018. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/4/18. (soa)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting #21 Motion PHV for James Englert. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/4/18. (soa)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting #20 Motion PHV Fee for Donald Adams Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/4/18. (soa)
September 4, 2018 Filing 32 PHV fees for Donald Adams and James Englert $ 400.00, receipt number WVND001973 (soa)
August 31, 2018 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canal Barge Company. (Stankewicz, Erin)
August 31, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Order on Public Motion,,,,, by Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc.. (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc. re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc.. (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Murray Energy Holdings Co. for Mon River Towing, Inc... (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Murray Energy Holdings Co. for Murray American Transportation, Inc... (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Murray Energy Holdings Co. for Murray American River Towing, Inc... (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Blalock on behalf of Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc. (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Blalock on behalf of Mon River Towing, Inc., Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc. (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Blalock on behalf of Murray American River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc., Mon River Towing, Inc. (Blalock, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - J. Englert Other Document filed by Canal Barge Company. (Stankewicz, Erin) Modified on 9/4/2018 (soa).
August 31, 2018 Filing 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Donald Adams Other Document filed by Canal Barge Company. (Stankewicz, Erin) Modified on 9/4/2018 (soa).
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC by Canal Barge Company.(Stankewicz, Erin)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC, Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC by Inland Marine Service, Inc., Campbell Transportation Co., Inc..(Powers, Todd)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Powers on behalf of Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc. (Powers, Todd)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance Other Document filed by Canal Barge Company. (Stankewicz, Erin)
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Blalock on behalf of The Ohio County Coal Company (Blalock, Joseph)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for John Sandberg. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/21/18. (soa)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER : Granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Laura Gust. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/21/18. (soa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 PHV fees for Laura Gust and John Sandberg: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW001966 (soa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by John S. Sandberg by The Ohio County Coal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Blalock, Joseph)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE by Laura J. Gust by The Ohio County Coal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Blalock, Joseph)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC, Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC of Proof of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fornella, Leonard)
July 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY re #1 Complaint, #6 Order on Public Motion: Claims to be filed by 8/31/18 with Clerk of Court; claimants desiring to contest claims of Bellaire Vessel Management and Bellaire Harbor Service must file an Answer to the Complaint by 8/31/18. (soa)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 Motion For approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, etc.; Directing the required Notice to be issued by Clerk; claimants to file claims and answer the Complaint by 8/31/18; public notice to be published in The Wheeling Intelligencer once a week for 4 successive weeks prior to 8/31/18; Bellaire Vessel Management and Bellaire Harbor Service shall mail notice to any person known to have made a claim; and other suits or legal proceedings arising out of this incident are enjoined. Service of this Order shall be made by Bellaire Vessel Management and Bellaire Harbor Service or their designee. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/17/18. (soa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value Stipulation for costs and letters of undertaking and for an Order directing issuance of the required notice and for issuance of an Injunction re #1 Complaint, by Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC, Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(soa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 VOIDED - Notice Issued In Error. NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY re #1 Complaint,, (soa) Modified on 7/16/2018 NEF regen. (cmd).
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC. (soa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC. (soa)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY, filed by Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC, Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC.Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2626647 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Value, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Freight Pending, #3 Attachment 1 - Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #4 Attachment 2 - Stipulation for Costs, #5 Attachment 3 - Letter of Undertaking (Allianz Global), #6 Attachment 4 - Letter of Undertaking (Navigators), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC
Represented By: Leonard Fornella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC
Represented By: Leonard Fornella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canal Barge Company
Represented By: Erin R. Stankewicz
Represented By: Donald Cornwall Adams
Represented By: James J. Englert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio County Coal Company
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Laura J. Gust
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Inland Marine Service, Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Murray American River Towing, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Laura J. Gust
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Murray American Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Laura J. Gust
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mon River Towing, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Laura J. Gust
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the Motor Vessel Capt Robert G Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?