Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
Defendant: The Ohio County Coal Company, Murray American Transportation, Inc., Canal Barge Company, Inc., Ohio County Coal Company, Murray American Towing, Inc., Mon-River Towing, Inc., Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC and Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC
Petitioner: Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
In Re: Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as the Owner of the M/V James R. Morehead, Official No. 1032410
Case Number: 5:2018cv00137
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. to Claimants pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(6) (Powers, Todd)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC. (Fornella, Leonard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC. (Fornella, Leonard)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 12/10/2018; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/17/2018; Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 1/7/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/16/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint and Claim by Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC, Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC.(Fornella, Leonard)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. by Ohio County Coal Company, Mon-River Towing, Inc., Murray American Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc..(Manning, Jacob)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Donald Cornwall Adams. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/15/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Donald C. Adams: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002004 (nmm) Modified on 10/15/2018: NEF Regenerated to Atty. Adams only (nmm). (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/16/2018) (nmm).
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donald C. Adams by Canal Barge Company, Inc.. (Vuljanic, Erin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 Canal Barge Company, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. by Canal Barge Company, Inc..(Vuljanic, Erin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canal Barge Company, Inc.. (Vuljanic, Erin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin R. Vuljanic on behalf of Canal Barge Company, Inc. (Vuljanic, Erin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. of Filing Affidavit of Publication (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Powers, Todd)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legal Notice)(Powers, Todd)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. to Claimants of Action Brought For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (Powers, Todd)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 8/27/18. (lmm)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 8/27/18. (lmm)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION Restraining Order and Order Ad Interim by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order re Restraining Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order re Order Ad Interim)(Powers, Todd)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION: Defendant The Ohio County Coal Company was inadvertently added to the docket at case opening and will be removed. (nmm)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. Parent Corporation identified as Blue Danube Incorporated. (Powers, Todd) Modified docket text on 8/22/2018 to include Parent Corp.; NEF Regenerated (nmm).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. re #1 Complaint, of Filing Exhibit A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vessel Value)(Powers, Todd)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY, filed by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2649824. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of No Pending Freight, #2 Letter of Undertaking, #3 Stipulation of Costs, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) Modified docket text on 8/21/2018 re: service copies (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio County Coal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray American Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canal Barge Company, Inc.
Represented By: Erin R. Vuljanic
Represented By: Donald Cornwall Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Coal Company
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray American Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mon-River Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC
Represented By: Leonard Fornella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellaire Vessel Management, LLC
Represented By: Leonard Fornella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as the Owner of the M/V James R. Morehead, Official No. 1032410
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?