Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. et al

Defendant: Murray American Transportation, Inc., Ohio County Coal Company, Murray American Towing, Inc., Mon-River Towing, Inc., Canal Barge Company, Inc., Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC and Bellaire Vessel Managment, LLC
Petitioner: Inland Marine Service, Inc. and Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
In Re: Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner and as Operator of the M/V Louise S, Official No. 513659
Case Number: 5:2018cv00138
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc. to Claimants pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(6) (Powers, Todd)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bellaire Vessel Managment, LLC. (Fornella, Leonard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC. (Fornella, Leonard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim emailed to attorneys, Sandberg and Wong. (soa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Claim by Bellaire Vessel Managment, LLC, Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC.(Fornella, Leonard)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. by Ohio County Coal Company, Mon-River Towing, Inc., Murray American Transportation, Inc., Murray American Towing, Inc..(Manning, Jacob)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/15/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/29/2018. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 12/17/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/15/18. (soa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Donald C. Adams: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002003 (nmm) Modified on 10/15/2018: NEF Regenerated to Atty. Adams only (nmm). (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/16/2018) (nmm).
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donald C. Adams by Canal Barge Company, Inc.. (Vuljanic, Erin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 Canal Barge Company, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. by Canal Barge Company, Inc..(Vuljanic, Erin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canal Barge Company, Inc.. (Vuljanic, Erin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin R. Vuljanic on behalf of Canal Barge Company, Inc. (Vuljanic, Erin)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc. of Publication (Attachments: #1 Legal Notice)(Powers, Todd)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc. to Claimants of Action Brought For Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (Powers, Todd)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING SUITS: Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/5/18. (soa)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESTRAINING ORDER: Granting #4 Motion Restraining Order; RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/5/18. (soa)(copies to defs. and those listed on schedule A) Modified on 9/6/2018 to note that copy was also sent to Erin Stankewicz. (soa).
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Restraining Order and Order Ad Interim by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order re Restraining Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order re Order Ad Interim)(Powers, Todd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Danube Incorporated for Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.; Corporate Parent Hammond Family Holdings, Inc. for Inland Marine Service, Inc... (Powers, Todd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Campbell Transportation Co., Inc., Inland Marine Service, Inc. re #1 Complaint, of Filing Exhibit A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vessel Value)(Powers, Todd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner and as Operator of the M/V Louise S, Official No. 513659, filed by Inland Marine Service, Inc., Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2649837. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of No Freight Pending, #2 Letter of Undertaking, #3 Stipulation for Costs, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell Transportation Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Inland Marine Service, Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Campbell Transportation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner and as Operator of the M/V Louise S, Official No. 513659
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray American Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Casey F. Wong
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Coal Company
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Casey F. Wong
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray American Towing, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Casey F. Wong
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mon-River Towing, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Sandberg
Represented By: Casey F. Wong
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canal Barge Company, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cornwall Adams
Represented By: Erin R. Vuljanic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC
Represented By: Leonard Fornella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellaire Vessel Managment, LLC
Represented By: Leonard Fornella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?