Pierce v. Bethany College(WV)
Plaintiff: Khallid Pierce
Defendant: Bethany College(WV) and Bethany College (WV)
Case Number: 5:2018cv00157
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Bethany College (WV). (Manning, Jacob)
November 9, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,, Complaint filed by Bethany College (WV). (Manning, Jacob)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REMOVING JOSEPH R. BLALOCK AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BETHANY COLLEGE and SUBSTITUTING JESSICA SPENCER BENEDICT: granting #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/2/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr) (nmm) Modified on 11/14/2018 re: service copies (nmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
November 2, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph R. Blalock for Jessica Spencer Benedict by Bethany College (WV). (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Manning, Jacob)
October 31, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION/PLAINTIFFS OFFER FOR ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION IN CIVIL ACTION (ADR) AGAINST DEFENDANT, by Khallid Pierce. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
October 31, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION TO ORDER IMMEDIATE CASE PLANNING CONFERENCE(S), MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE TRIAL AND MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST THE DEFENDANT, by Khallid Pierce. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( #1 Notice of Removal) by Khallid Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service re: Motion to Amend and Notice of Motion, #3 Proposed Amended Complaint as Exhibits A/A(2), #4 Proposed Amended Complaint, #5 Fax Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Manning, Jacob)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Bethany College (WV) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION (Blalock, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT BETHANY COLLEGE'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Bethany College (WV). (Blalock, Joseph)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Titled "Answer with Motion to Proceed with Civil Action") filed by Khallid Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 ROSEBORO NOTICE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/4/2018 (per USPS website). (nmm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/4/2018 (per USPS website). (nmm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Bethany College's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and for Immediate Trial filed by Bethany College (WV). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Blalock, Joseph)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Amended Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/29/18 per USPS. (lmm)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ROSEBORO NOTICE: re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bethany College (WV). Within 14 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/1/18. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bethany College (WV). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Manning, Jacob)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bethany College (WV). (Manning, Jacob)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bethany College (WV). (Manning, Jacob)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/24/2018 (per USPS website). (nmm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr; copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
September 25, 2018 Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone added. (nmm)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Counter-Claim for Motion to Dismiss Claim/Case), filed by Khallid Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/25/2018; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2018; Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/21/2018. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr; copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr; copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Brooke County, West Virginia, (case number 18-C-67), filed by Bethany College(WV). Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2669520. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certified copy of State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Bethany College(WV)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany College(WV)
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany College (WV)
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Represented By: Jessica Spencer Benedict
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khallid Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?