Colson v. Shreiner et al

Plaintiff: Robert P. Colson
Defendant: Ricky Shreiner and Shreiner Rentals, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00159
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder and Amendments due by 12/26/2018; Discovery due by 10/25/2019; Motions due by 11/15/2019; Responses due by 12/6/2019; Replies due by 12/16/2019; Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/9/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2020 02:00 PM in Wheeling, West Virginia; Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 2/4/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling, West Virginia. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/1/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Ricky Shreiner, Shreiner Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Montgomery, Timothy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Ricky Shreiner, Shreiner Rentals, LLC.(Montgomery, Timothy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shreiner Rentals, LLC. (Montgomery, Timothy)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/24/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2018. Discovery due by 11/26/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/24/18. (lmm)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Brooke County, West Virginia, (case number 18-C-63), filed by Shreiner Rentals, LLC, Ricky Shreiner. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2670574. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court docket and copy of Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - copy of the Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colson v. Shreiner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Shreiner
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreiner Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Timothy A. Montgomery
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Colson
Represented By: Kevin M. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?