Moore et al v. Braddock Construction, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Heather Moore
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation and Dexter W. Skidmore
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Braddock Construction, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: James Meyers, DOTPROCESSAGENTS.COM,LLC, Timothy Sivic and Safety Concern, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00162
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk, U. S. District Court to Clerk, Circuit Court of Wetzel Co., WV regarding #10 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, with cert. copies of #10 and docket sheet. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2018: #1 cert. copy of docket sheet) (soa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2018: #2 cert. copy of #10 Order) (soa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #3 Executed Letter) (lmm).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND: Granting #6 Motion to Remand to State Court; this Court declines to award costs and attorneys' fees; case remanded to Circuit Court of Wetzel Co., WV. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/1/18. (soa)(copy to Clerk, Circuit Court of Wetzel Co.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Heather Moore(as Administrator of The Estate of Michael Ray Moore, her husband, deceased), Heather Moore(as Administrator of The Estate of Braylie McKenzie Moore, her daughter, deceased). (Mohler, Travis)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand filed by Braddock Construction, LLC. (Craycraft, P)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Braddock Construction, LLC's Third Party Complaint against Safety Concern, Inc., Timothy Sivic, James Meyers, DOTPROCESSAGENTS.COM,LLC, filed by Braddock Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Craycraft, P)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Heather Moore(as Administrator of The Estate of Braylie McKenzie Moore, her daughter, deceased). (Mohler, Travis)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Answer of Braddock Construction, LLC to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Braddock Construction, LLC.(Craycraft, P)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Wetzel County. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 3, #2 Part 3 of 3) (lmm)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/26/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/9/2018. Discovery due by 11/23/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/26/18. (lmm)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Braddock Construction, LLC Notice of Change of Attorney Information (Perkins, Jenna)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court Wetzel County, (case number 18-C-58), filed by Braddock Construction, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2672016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Administrative Ruling, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Skidmore's Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Antero's Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Braddock Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: Christopher A. Brumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter W. Skidmore
Represented By: David A. Bosak
Represented By: Matthew A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Braddock Construction, LLC
Represented By: Jenna H. Perkins
Represented By: Kevin M. Ward
Represented By: P Joseph Craycraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Moore
Represented By: Dino S. Colombo
Represented By: Travis T Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: DOTPROCESSAGENTS.COM,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Timothy Sivic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Safety Concern, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?