Tenaglio v. Weirton Medical Center
Plaintiff: Vincent Tenaglio
Defendant: Weirton Medical Center
Case Number: 5:2018cv00182
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vincent Tenaglio. Weirton Medical Center waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Cassidy, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Vincent Tenaglio re #2 Request for Waiver of Service, #1 Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint, #2 Attachment Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Attachment Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Attachment Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Attachment Exhibit D to Complaint, #6 Attachment Summons in Civil Action, #7 Attachment Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Cassidy, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Weirton Medical Center on 11/19/2018 by Vincent Tenaglio. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2019. (Cassidy, Patrick)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Weirton Medical Center, filed by Vincent Tenaglio. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2699805. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Complaint presented to WVHRC, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Exhibit C - Language re: CBA grievance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenaglio v. Weirton Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Tenaglio
Represented By: Patrick S. Cassidy
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weirton Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?