WH Midwest, LLC v. A.D. Baker Homes, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: WH Midwest, LLC
Defendant: MJB Drafting Services, LLC, Cayla Black, Matthew Black, A.D. Baker Homes, Inc. and Unknown Architect Number 1
Case Number: 5:2018cv00183
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WH Midwest, LLC. A.D. Baker Homes, Inc. waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Sbrolla, Philip)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Freeman. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/15/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason N. Bing. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/15/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Christopher J. Freeman: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002036 (nmm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Jason N. Bing: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002035 (nmm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT to Register of Copyrights on the Filing re #1 Complaint. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Register of Copyrights via email) (nmm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Freeman by WH Midwest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbrolla, Philip)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason N. Bing, Esquire by WH Midwest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbrolla, Philip)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attys. Freeman and Bing. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by WH Midwest, LLC. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2700290. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration Number VA0001842229 related to the "Covington" home plan, #2 Exhibit B - Copyright Registration Number VA0002081794 related to "Westport" home plan, #3 Exhibit C - "Ortiz Final Drawings", #4 Exhibit D - Photographs, #5 Exhibit E - Plans/Drawings referred to as "Black Infringing Plans", #6 Exhibit F - drawing of Wayne Homes Covington model design with Craftsman Elevation, #7 Exhibit G - Photograph of Infringing Black House, as constructed by A.D. Baker, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WH Midwest, LLC v. A.D. Baker Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJB Drafting Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayla Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D. Baker Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Kepple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Architect Number 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WH Midwest, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Freeman
Represented By: Philip John Sbrolla
Represented By: Jason N. Bing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?