Hinerman v. Jumba et al

Plaintiff: Raymond A. Hinerman
Defendant: Jeffrey Jumba and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv00191
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Raymond A. Hinerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McCune, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL: Granting #12 Motion for Leave to File; plaintiff's counsel to file referenced documents under seal. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 1/14/19. (soa)
January 10, 2019 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release, #2 Exhibit Addendum to Release)(Gallaway, Michael) Modified on 1/16/2019 to seal Exhibit Nos. 1 & 2 which are documents to be sealed as noted in #16 Order. NEF regenerated. (soa).
January 9, 2019 14 Proposed Order re #12 MOTION for Leave to File , #13 MEMORANDUM by Raymond A. Hinerman. (McCune, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 13 MEMORANDUM by Raymond A. Hinerman re #12 MOTION for Leave to File . (McCune, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 12 MOTION for Leave to File by Raymond A. Hinerman. (McCune, Daniel)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/1/2019. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2019. Motions due by 2/14/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 3/24/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 1/2/19. (soa)
December 28, 2018 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gallaway, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AND SERVE MEMORANDUM REGARDING #5 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND: Responses due by 1/10/2019; Replies due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 12/27/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
December 21, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Memoranda Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company re #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Memoranda Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand . (Gallaway, Michael)
December 21, 2018 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Memoranda Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gallaway, Michael)
December 18, 2018 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Raymond A. Hinerman. (McCune, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 5 MOTION to Remand by Raymond A. Hinerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCune, Daniel)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 12/25/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/1/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/27/18. (soa)
November 26, 2018 3 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Gallaway, Michael)
November 26, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Gallaway, Michael)
November 20, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Hancock Co., WV, (case number 18-C-71) Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0424-2709015, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -State Court civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit B -Notice to Defend, #3 Exhibit C - Praecipe To Discontinue, #4 Exhibit D - Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit E - Summary of medical expenses/wage loss, #6 Exhibit F - State Court case, #7 Exhibit G - State Court docket, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinerman v. Jumba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Hinerman
Represented By: Daniel L. McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Jumba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: R. Gregory McDermott
Represented By: Michael G. Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?