Matthews v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Curtis Matthews
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv00196
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: James P Mazzone
1 Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/4/19. (soa)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/2/19. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice of Deficient Pleading #2 Notice of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/3/18. (lmm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 FTCA Form) (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Curtis Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/30/18 letter, #2 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?