Ammirante et al v. Ohio County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Lindsay Ammirante, Autumn Troullos and Rachel Miller
Defendant: Kimberly S. Miller, Ohio County Board of Education, Rick Jones and Joe Kolb
Case Number: 5:2019cv00012
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder & Amendments due by 6/30/2019. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Motions due by 12/20/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2020 03:30 PM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 3/24/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 3/28/19. (lmm)
March 28, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr: Scheduling/Status Conference held on 3/28/2019. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (soa)
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindsay Ammirante, Rachel Miller, Autumn Troullos Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Turner, Woodrow)
March 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Woodrow E. Turner (Turner, Woodrow)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Woodrow E. Turner (Turner, Woodrow)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rick Jones, Kimberly S. Miller, Ohio County Board of Education Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A). (Manning, Jacob)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Kolb Rule 26(a)(1)Initial Discovery Disclosures (Wyant, David)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr.on 3/15/19. (lmm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wyant, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joe Kolb. (Buck, Thomas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lindsay Ammirante, Rachel Miller, Autumn Troullos. (Turner, Woodrow)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Ohio County Board of Education.(Manning, Jacob)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Rick Jones.(Manning, Jacob)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Kimberly S. Miller.(Manning, Jacob)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Attorney Turner regarding #2 Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (incorrect attorney deleted; correct attorney added) (lmm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joe Kolb. (Wyant, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Joe Kolb. (Wyant, David)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Fitzsimmons on behalf of Rick Jones, Kimberly S. Miller (Fitzsimmons, Robert)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent E. Wear on behalf of Rick Jones, Kimberly S. Miller (Wear, Brent)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/8/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/15/2019. Discovery due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 2/1/19. (Attorney Turner via US Mail) (lmm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION of Attorney Turner. (counsel via US Mail) (lmm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, (case number 18-C-294), filed by Autumn Troullos, Lindsay Ammirante, Rachel Miller. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2750471. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consent to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing of the Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ammirante et al v. Ohio County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly S. Miller
Represented By: Denise D. Pentino
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Brent E. Wear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio County Board of Education
Represented By: Denise D. Pentino
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Jones
Represented By: Denise D. Pentino
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Brent E. Wear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Kolb
Represented By: David L. Wyant
Represented By: Thomas E. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Ammirante
Represented By: Buddy Turner
Represented By: Mark E Gaydos
Represented By: Woodrow E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Troullos
Represented By: Buddy Turner
Represented By: Mark E Gaydos
Represented By: Woodrow E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Miller
Represented By: Buddy Turner
Represented By: Mark E Gaydos
Represented By: Woodrow E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?