Mey v. Monitronics International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Defendant: Home Security USA, LLC and Monitronics International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00176
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING ENTIRE ACTION until 8/23/19. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/16/19. (soa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Stay Entire Case by Home Security USA, LLC. (Kahle, Karen)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AS TO DEFENDANT MONITRONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 7/2/19. (lmm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Monitronics International, Inc. of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay (Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AS TO TIME FOR RESPONDING TO COMPLAINT. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before July 15, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 6/27/19. (lmm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen E. Kahle on behalf of Home Security USA, LLC (Kahle, Karen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION as to time for responding to complaint by Home Security USA, LLC. (Kahle, Karen)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/23/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/30/2019. Discovery due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 6/19/19. (lmm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monitronics International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ascent Capital Group, Inc. for Monitronics International, Inc... (Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Monitronics International, Inc..(Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Home Security USA, LLC served through SOS on 5/22/2019. (soa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diana Mey. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2820982. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mey v. Monitronics International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Security USA, LLC
Represented By: Karen E. Kahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monitronics International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Holmstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Represented By: Ryan McCune Donovan
Represented By: Andrew C. Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?