Lightner v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Debra Sue Lighter and Debra Sue Lightner
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Lincoln National Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00195
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Delk, David)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION: Approving #4 Stipulation; Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 7/22/2019; Lincoln National Corporation answer due 7/22/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 6/18/19. (soa)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extension of Time to File and Serve Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Delk, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.. (Delk, David)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/26/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 6/17/2019. (kac)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall Co., WV, (case number 19-C-112). Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0424-2840677, filed by Lincoln National Corporation, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service information, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of NOR, #3 State Court File, #4 Summons - Liberty, #5 Summons - Lincoln, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightner v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Corporation
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Sue Lighter
Represented By: Michelle L Marinacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Sue Lightner
Represented By: Michelle L Marinacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?