Keith Nicholson Services, LLC v. American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keith Nicholson Services, LLC
Defendant: Lori D. Schaber, American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC, Rosemary M. Brown, Leslie B. Schaber, Atlantic Construction Fabrics, Inc., Company Wrench, Ltd., Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C., Alpha Integrity Management, LLC and APP Midstream, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00205
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC. (Norris, Melanie)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Kevin Gormley. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/14/19. (soa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 30 PHV fee for Kevin Gormley: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002255. (soa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin M. Gormley by American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Application)(Norris, Melanie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Defendants, American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC, APP Midstream, LLC and Rosemary M. Brown by American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Norris, Melanie)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Company Wrench, Ltd. by Keith Nicholson Services, LLC. (Kennedy, E.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lori D. Schaber served on 7/22/2019. (Kennedy, E.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Leslie B. Schaber served on 7/22/2019. (Kennedy, E.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rosemary M. Brown served on 7/22/2019. (Kennedy, E.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc. by Keith Nicholson Services, LLC. (Kennedy, E.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION [AGREED] Between Plaintiff and Defendant Company Wrench Ltd to Extend Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Company Wrench, Ltd.. (Adkins, Wendy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, Extending Answer Deadline of Defendant American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC by Keith Nicholson Services, LLC. (Kennedy, E.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C. by Keith Nicholson Services, LLC. (Kennedy, E.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to APP Midstream, LLC served on 7/2/2019. (kac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc. served on 7/2/2019. (kac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C. served on 7/2/2019. (kac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Atlantic Construction Fabrics, Inc. served on 7/2/2019. (kac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC served on 7/2/2019. (kac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Company Wrench, Ltd. served on 7/2/2019. (kac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alpha Integrity Management, LLC served on 7/2/2019. (kac)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION: Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings; Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr recused. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 6/26/2019. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keith Nicholson Services, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2847071. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Right-Of-Way and Easement Agreement as to Schaber, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Right-Of-Way and Easement Agreement as to Brown, #3 Exhibit C - copy of documents constituting the least of said Real Property as to "Casterly Rock Well Pad", #4 Exhibit D - Defendant APP bid quantities sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Defendant APP executed quantities sheet, #6 Exhibit F - adjusted initial bid sheet, #7 Exhibit G - copies of the Plaintiff's invoices submitted to Defendant APP for the Casterly Rock Well Pad project, #8 Exhibit H - copies of Notices of Mechanic's Lien, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith Nicholson Services, LLC v. American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori D. Schaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Gormley
Represented By: Melanie A. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary M. Brown
Represented By: Kevin M. Gormley
Represented By: Melanie A. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie B. Schaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Construction Fabrics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company Wrench, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Integrity Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APP Midstream, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Gormley
Represented By: Melanie A. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Nicholson Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kimble
Represented By: E. Ryan Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?