Bowman v. Panepinto Law Office et al
Plaintiff: Michael D. Bowman
Defendant: Panepinto Law Office and Mark D. Panepinto
Case Number: 5:2019cv00231
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Clerk's Judgment, #10 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Memorandum & Opinion, Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/16/19. (soa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court on 9/13/2019. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the plaintiffs #1 complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that this case be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/13/2019. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/19/19 (according to USPO tracking). (soa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending Dismissal Without Prejudice of #1 Complaint and Denial as Moot of #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Written objections due within 14 days of being served with this R/R. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 8/16/19. (soa)(copy to Pltff. by cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/2019. (nmm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Complaint mailed to Pltff. by cert. mail. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Envelope Received, containing #1 , #2 , #3 , & #4 . (soa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael D. Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets)(soa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Michael D. Bowman. (soa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael D. Bowman. (soa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark D. Panepinto, Panepinto Law Office, filed by Michael D. Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Panepinto Law Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panepinto Law Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Panepinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?