Sharp v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Timothy Wayne Sharp
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 5:2019cv00232
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 9/27/19. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/19. (lmm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus sent to Petitioner by cert. mail. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Envelope Received containing #1 , #2 , & #3 . (soa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy Wayne Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Ledger sheets)(soa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Wayne Sharp. (soa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Hudgins, filed by Timothy Wayne Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #4 Certificate of Service)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Wayne Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?