Beuterbaugh v. Warden, FCI Gilmer
Petitioner: Charles Jesse Beuterbaugh
Respondent: Warden, FCI Gilmer
Case Number: 5:2019cv00239
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002679 (nmm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/12/2019. (nmm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 2241 forms) (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden, FCI Gilmer, filed by Charles Jesse Beuterbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Application, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beuterbaugh v. Warden, FCI Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCI Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Jesse Beuterbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?