American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC et al v. Schaber et al
Plaintiff: American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC and APP Midstream LLC
Defendant: Leslie B. Schaber and Lori D. Schaber
Case Number: 5:2019cv00250
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APP Midstream LLC, American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Petroleum Partners Holdings, LLC for APP Midstream LLC, American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC.. (Norris, Melanie)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2019. Discovery due by 12/5/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/7/19. (lmm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC. Leslie B. Schaber waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Lori D. Schaber waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Norris, Melanie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony William Selbe on behalf of Leslie B. Schaber, Lori D. Schaber (Selbe, Anthony)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Hammond on behalf of Leslie B. Schaber, Lori D. Schaber (Hammond, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/26/19. (lmm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 PHV Filing fee for Attorney Gormly: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002267 (lmm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie A. Norris on behalf of APP Midstream LLC, American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC (Norris, Melanie) Modified on 8/23/2019 to correct event type(lmm).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorney Gormly. (lmm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leslie B. Schaber, Lori D. Schaber, filed by American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC, APP Midstream LLC.Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2885802. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SUA, #2 Exhibit B - ROW, #3 Exhibit C - Letter from Kevin M. Gormly, #4 Exhibit D - Letter from Michael J. Hammond, #5 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Revised Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - 8/5/19 letter from Michael J. Hammond, #8 Exhibit H - 8/7/19 letter from Kevin M. Gormly, #9 Exhibit I - 8/19/19 letter from Michael J. Hammond, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC et al v. Schaber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie B. Schaber
Represented By: Anthony William Selbe
Represented By: Michael Joseph Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori D. Schaber
Represented By: Anthony William Selbe
Represented By: Michael Joseph Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Petroleum Partners Operating, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Gormly
Represented By: Melanie A. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APP Midstream LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Gormly
Represented By: Melanie A. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?