Reed et al v. Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Schenkel, Emily Wines, Lisa Dolence, Keith Reed and Mark Garan
Defendant: Alecto Healthcare Services Wheeling, LLC and Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00263
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 12/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/12/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 12/19/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/1/2019. (kac)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alecto Healthcare Services Wheeling, LLC, Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carr, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alecto Healthcare Services Wheeling, LLC served on 10/10/2019. (Cogan, Timothy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC served on 10/10/2019. (Cogan, Timothy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney Mersich. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/30/19. (lmm)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney Stember. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/30/19. (lmm)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney Davidson- Welling. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/30/19. (lmm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for John Stember, Maureen Davidson-Welling and Vincent Mersich: $ 600.00, receipt number WVNW002294 (nmm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Vincent Mersich, Esq. by Lisa Dolence, Mark Garan, Keith Reed, Elizabeth Schenkel, Emily Wines. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cogan, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Maureen Davidson-Welling, Esq. by Lisa Dolence, Mark Garan, Keith Reed, Elizabeth Schenkel, Emily Wines. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cogan, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Stember, Esq. by Lisa Dolence, Mark Garan, Keith Reed, Elizabeth Schenkel, Emily Wines. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cogan, Timothy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorneys Mersich, Davidson-Welling and Stember. (lmm)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alecto Healthcare Services Wheeling, LLC, Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC, filed by Lisa Dolence, Elizabeth Schenkel, Keith Reed, Mark Garan, Emily Wines. Receipt #0424-2896627. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Record of Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Press Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Announcement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Schenkel
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: Vincent J. Mersich
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Wines
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: Vincent J. Mersich
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Dolence
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: Vincent J. Mersich
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Reed
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: Vincent J. Mersich
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Garan
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: Vincent J. Mersich
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alecto Healthcare Services Wheeling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?