Cummings v. City of Wheeling, West Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Richard Cummings
Defendant: Harry Myers and City of Wheeling, West Virginia
Case Number: 5:2019cv00271
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Cummings for PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANTS CITY OF WHEELING, WEST VIRGINIA AND HARRY MYERS. (Simmons, Lonnie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Cummings for Plaintiff's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 6/26/2020. Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Motions due by 9/11/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2020. Pretrial Conference/final Settlement Conference set for 11/23/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr.; Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 12/8/2020 08:30 AM (first case) in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/24/19. (soa)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buck, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY by City of Wheeling, West Virginia, Harry Myers to #5 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Buck, Thomas)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Cummings. (Simmons, Lonnie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harry Myers. Harry Myers waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Buck, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Wheeling, West Virginia, Harry Myers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS)(Buck, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/25/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/20/19. (soa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio Co., WV, (case number 19-C-190) Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0424-2904406, filed by Harry Myers, City of Wheeling, West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket/Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance/Proof Service, #3 Notice of Filing NOR, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. City of Wheeling, West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cummings
Represented By: Lonnie C. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Myers
Represented By: Thomas E. Buck
Represented By: Morgan S. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wheeling, West Virginia
Represented By: Thomas E. Buck
Represented By: Morgan S. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?