Carter et al v. Tristar Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Carter and Raeann Carter
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation and Tristar Products, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00284
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder/Amendments due by 7/29/2020. Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Motions due by 10/14/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 12/21/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/5/2021 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 11/18/19. (lmm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Steven D. Cohn. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 11/1/19. (lmm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 PHV Filing fee for Steven D. Cohn: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002321 (lmm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven D. Cohn by Charles Carter, Raeann Carter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Booth, Patrick)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Kohl's Corporation.(Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Tristar Products, Inc..(Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CORRECTION. Kohl's Corporation and Tristar Products, Inc.'s answer due 10/16/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/10/19. (lmm)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSE DATE. Kohl's Corporation and Tristar Products, Inc. answer due 10/14/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/10/19. (lmm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Regarding Response Date by Tristar Products, Inc.. (Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Booth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Booth, Patrick)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Chaffin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chaffin, Eric)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/6/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/3/19. (soa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kohl's Corporation. (Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tristar Products, Inc.. (Holmstrand, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002299 (lmm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, (case number 19-C-216), filed by Tristar Products, Inc., Kohl's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket)(lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Tristar Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Holmstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Holmstrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Carter
Represented By: Timothy J. Manchin
Represented By: Patrick C. Booth
Represented By: Eric Chaffin
Represented By: Taylor Burkhart Downs
Represented By: Steven D. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raeann Carter
Represented By: Timothy J. Manchin
Represented By: Patrick C. Booth
Represented By: Eric Chaffin
Represented By: Taylor Burkhart Downs
Represented By: Steven D. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?