Parker v. Pearsall et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Parker
Defendant: Unknown, Jim Nolte and RN Pearsall
Case Number: 5:2019cv00288
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 1983 Packet)(soa)(Sent to Pltff. by cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00424. (soa) Modified on 10/10/2019 to correct transfer date (soa).
October 9, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of West Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 10/09/2019. Copies mailed 10/09/2019.(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert D. Parker. (jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/10/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Jim Nolte, RN Pearsall, Unknown (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (No service copies provided.)(jmey, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 10/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Pearsall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Nolte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Pearsall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?