Morgan, v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Willie James Morgan
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 5:2019cv00301
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNW002339. (soa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Letter. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/12/19. (soa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Cheryl Dean Riley, Clerk, to Willie James Morgan regarding #3 Notice (Other), 5 DOCUMENT filed by Willie James Morgan. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 PTAR)(soa)(sent by cert. mail to Petitioner) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other), #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/30/19. (soa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus mailed to Petitioner by cert. mail. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus set to Petitioner by cert. mail. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Hudgins, filed by Willie James Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan, v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie James Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?