Parker v. Pearsal et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Parker
Defendant: RN Hileman and RN Pearsal
Case Number: 5:2019cv00303
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
2 Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey per Order entered in 3:20MC1. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. There are no hearings scheduled before the District Judge to be reset at this time.Copy of NEF and MC Order to pro se party by regular mail. (cmd)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CHANGE THE CAUSE OF ACTION: an initial partial filing fee of $31.17 shall be forwarded to the Financial Deputy Clerk. The Clerk is also directed to change the Cause of Action from 41:1983 Civil Rights to 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/2/2019. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to FDC and TC w/Consent to Collection via us mail) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER TO FILE PROPERLY COMPLETED PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT AND CURRENT LEDGER SHEETS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/14/2019. (nmm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/7/2019. (nmm)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE PROPERLY COMPLETED PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT AND CURRENT LEDGER SHEETS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/5/2019. (copy to pro se plaintiff w/PTAR via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #2 PTAR) (nmm).
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment III and IIII; 2B-C(letter re: ledger sheets), #2 Exhibit 2B - Notice re: lockdown, #3 Exhibit X Y Z "Trust Fund Deposit" docs, #4 Cover letter, #5 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment I and II (Statement of Claim), #2 Exhibit 1A-1B (medical records)(SEALED), #3 Exhibit 2A (medical record) (SEALED), #4 Administrative Remedy docs, #5 Cover letter, #6 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) Modified on 11/5/2019 to Seal attachments per Judge Stamp (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Pearsal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Hileman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Pearsal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?