Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: Welded Construction, L.P., TransCanada USA Services and Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00322
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Case Transfer Complete - Case transferred to District of Delaware on 1/22/20. District of Delaware's case number is 1:20-cv-95. (lmm)
January 22, 2020 Case transferred to District of Delaware. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (lmm)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The #9 Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED IN PART. This matter is hereby ORDERED TRANSFERRED to the District of Delaware. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/22/20. (lmm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc. Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Hughes, Charles)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.. (Hughes, Charles)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL. Counts II and III of the Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/7/20. (lmm)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada USA Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Meadows, John)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada USA Services. (Meadows, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL filed by Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.. (Hughes, Charles)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada USA Services. (lmm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COUNT IV OF PLAINTIFF'S #1 COMPLAINT by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and TransCanada USA Services.(lmm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF #3 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC and TransCanada USA Services. (lmm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, TransCanada USA Services. (lmm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from US Bankruptcy Court, (case number 18-12378; ap-53), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 WVND Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc. v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Equipment Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Charles R. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransCanada USA Services
Represented By: John J. Meadows
Represented By: Devon Joseph Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: John J. Meadows
Represented By: Devon Joseph Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?