Nana's Landing, LLC v. Murray American River Towing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nana's Landing, LLC
Defendant: Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC, Murray American River Towing, Inc. and Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00004
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc..(Powers, Todd)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Orders Ad Interim, #3 Exhibit Notice to Claimant, #4 Exhibit Notice of Publication, #5 Exhibit Restraining Orders)(Powers, Todd)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/19/20. (lmm)
February 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Murray American River Towing, Inc. of Suggestion on Pendency of Bankruptcy for Murray Energy Corporation, et al., and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Voluntary Petition)(Blalock, Joseph)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC served on 2/4/2020; Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. served on 2/4/2020; Murray American River Towing, Inc. served on 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 SOS return - Murray American River, #2 SOS return - Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC)(lmm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nana's Landing, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2966668. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nana's Landing, LLC v. Murray American River Towing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellaire Harbor Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray American River Towing, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nana's Landing, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy M McGraw
Represented By: James G. Bordas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?