Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00023
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw: Attorney Leora Ben-Ami terminated. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/3/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Pizzo on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. (Pizzo, John)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw of Atty. Leora Ben-Ami as counsel for Plaintiffs by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeanna Wacker. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/24/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mira Mulvaney. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/24/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leora Ben-Ami. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/24/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. waiver sent on 2/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Companion, James)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw As Counsel and ORDERS that Attorneys Thomas F. Fleming, Sam Kwon, Ashley Ross and Christopher J. Citro are hereby withdrawn as counsel for the Plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/13/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 PHV Filing fee for Leora Ben-Ami, Mira Mulvaney and Jeanna Wacker: $ 600.00, receipt number WVNW002390 (nmm)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Attorneys Thomas F. Fleming, Sam Kwon, Ashley Ross and Christopher J. Citro by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeanna Wacker by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mira Mulvaney by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Leora Ben-Ami by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attys. Ben-Ami, Flemming, Wacker, Mulvaney, Kwon, Ross and Citro (nmm)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002385 (nmm)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent C.H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG for Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FOR PATENT CASES INVOLVING AN ABBREVIATED NEW DRUG APPLICATION (ANDA) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent Appplication Publication, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: John D. Pizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?